THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:41:36 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaid drive E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 54
VANDERBRINK DR
Brampton Ontario L6R 0E7
Phone: (204) 295-2584
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 497 Fernforest Dr
Brampton ON L6R 2V4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Muhammad Ghalib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghalib (CPSO#: 116809 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2100 Bovaid drive E
Brampton Ontario L6R 3J7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9054942120
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 54
VANDERBRINK DR
Brampton Ontario L6R 0E7
Phone: (204) 295-2584
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 497 Fernforest Dr
Brampton ON L6R 2V4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 17 May 2017
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 17 2017
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Muhammad Ghalib Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Ghalib (CPSO#: 116809 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Aug 2018
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Aug 16 2018
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Muhammad Ghalib may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Muhammad Ghalib may practise medicine independently in psychiatry, only.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Karachi, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 16 Aug 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 16 Aug 2018