THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:05:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Elizabeth Munro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Munro (CPSO#: 116811 )
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
705-474-8600 Extn: 3457

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: North Bay Regional Health Centre
50 College Drive
North Bay Ontario P1B 5A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (705) 474-8600
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 30 Jun 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
North Bay Regional Health Centre North Bay
HOSPITAL: North Bay Regional Health Centre
LOCATION: North Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Gillian Elizabeth Munro Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 29 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Munro (CPSO#: 116811 )
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
Business Address: 50 College Dr
North Bay ON P1B 0A4
705-474-8600 Extn: 3457

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN ELIZABETH SCOTT MUNRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNRO is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. GILLIAN ELIZABETH SCOTT MUNRO may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MUNRO is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2014

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2018