THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 02:47:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2090 2nd Avenue
Whitehorse Yukon Y1A 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 867-667-8333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anika N. Maraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maraj (CPSO#: 116830 )
Business Address: 2090 2nd Avenue
Whitehorse Yukon Y1A 1B6
867-667-8333
Business Address: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Address: 330-2237 2nd Ave
Whitehorse YT Y1A 0K7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2090 2nd Avenue
Whitehorse Yukon Y1A 1B6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 867-667-8333
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 26 Aug 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 26 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - British Columbia
Canada - Yukon Territory

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Quinte Health Belleville
Unity Health Toronto Toronto
HOSPITAL: Quinte Health
LOCATION: Belleville

HOSPITAL: Unity Health Toronto
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Anika N. Maraj Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Jul 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Maraj (CPSO#: 116830 )
Business Address: 2090 2nd Avenue
Whitehorse Yukon Y1A 1B6
867-667-8333
Business Address: 30 Bond St
Toronto ON M5B 1W8
Business Address: 330-2237 2nd Ave
Whitehorse YT Y1A 0K7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIKA NATASHA MARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARAJ is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANIKA NATASHA MARAJ may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MARAJ is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 20 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 20 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2018