THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:18:22 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Benin, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 229 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario l8n 1b6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057458295
Fax: 1-289-800-9376

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Onyegbule Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Onyegbule (CPSO#: 116842 )
Business Address: 229 King St E
Hamilton ON L8N 1B6
Business Address: 460 Brant Street
Suite 201
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Benin, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 229 King Street East
Hamilton Ontario l8n 1b6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9057458295
Fax: 1-289-800-9376

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 08 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 08 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Northwest Territories
Canada - Nova Scotia

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Henry Onyegbule Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. H. Onyegbule (CPSO#: 116842 )
Business Address: 229 King St E
Hamilton ON L8N 1B6
Business Address: 460 Brant Street
Suite 201
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENRY ONYEMAECHI ONYEGBULE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONYEGBULE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HENRY ONYEMAECHI ONYEGBULE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ONYEGBULE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Benin, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Aug 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Aug 2018