THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 03:53:58 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1983
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Angelina St N
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: 7053246111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 167 Rolph St, Tillsonburg, ON N4G 3
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Agaibi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Agaibi (CPSO#: 116848 )
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
(519) 842-3611
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058452571
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10 Angelina St N
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
Phone: 7053246111
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 167 Rolph St, Tillsonburg, ON N4G 3
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
Phone: (519) 842-3611
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
Egypt

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ross Memorial Hospital Lindsay
Halton Healthcare Services Corporation Oakville
Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital Tillsonburg
HOSPITAL: Ross Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Lindsay

HOSPITAL: Halton Healthcare Services Corporation
LOCATION: Oakville

HOSPITAL: Tillsonburg District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Tillsonburg

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: S. Agaibi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Jun 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Agaibi (CPSO#: 116848 )
Business Address: 167 Rolph Street
Tillsonburg Ontario N4G 3Y9
(519) 842-3611
Business Address: 10 Angeline Street North
Lindsay Ontario K9V 4M8
(705) 324-6111
Business Address: 3001 Hospital Gate
Oakville Ontario L6M 0L8
(905) 845-2571

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL MAKRAM AGAIBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGAIBI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SAMUEL MAKRAM AGAIBI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AGAIBI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Ain Shams University Faculty of Medicine, 1983

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 24 Aug 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Aug 2018