THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:28:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ilorin, 2000
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Psychiatry and
Behavioural Neurosciences
100 West 5th St
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew T. Olagunju Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Olagunju (CPSO#: 116849 )
Business Address: 109-644 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 1A1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ilorin, 2000

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Department of Psychiatry and
Behavioural Neurosciences
100 West 5th St
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 01 Jul 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jul 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Nigeria

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Andrew T. Olagunju Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Aug 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Olagunju (CPSO#: 116849 )
Business Address: 109-644 Main St W
Hamilton ON L8S 1A1

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
10 Mar 2023
30 Jun 2026
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 10 2023
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2026
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Andrew Toyin Olagunju may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry and Behavioural Neurosciences, Division of Forensic
Psychiatry, McMaster University, in which Dr. Olagunju holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Olagunju no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Olagunju's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Olagunju's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020, and expires on June 30, 2026.
Upon renewal of Dr. Olagunju's academic appointment at McMaster
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. Andrew Toyin Olagunju may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of
Psychiatry and Behavioural Neurosciences, Division of Forensic
Psychiatry, McMaster University, in which Dr. Olagunju holds an
academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from
the date of issuance or when Dr. Olagunju no longer holds the academic
appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following
events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or
without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. Olagunju's
clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional
conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a
report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. Olagunju's
certificate of registration, following consideration of the
practice assessment report.


Note: This certificate is issued on July 1, 2020, and expires on June 30, 2026.
Upon renewal of Dr. Olagunju's academic appointment at McMaster
University, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations
in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ilorin, 2000

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2026
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Sep 2018