THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:02:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Box 678 - 1053 Carling Ave.
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 16486
Fax: 613-761-5334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. R. AKTER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Akter (CPSO#: 116874 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: The Ottawa Hospital, Civic Campus
Box 678 - 1053 Carling Ave.
Ottawa Ontario K1Y 4E9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-798-5555
Extension: 16486
Fax: 613-761-5334

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Geriatric Medicine
Effective: 25 Sep 2019
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 10 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Geriatric Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 10 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. R. AKTER MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 11 Dec 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Akter (CPSO#: 116874 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIPA AKTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKTER is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RIPA AKTER may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKTER is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Dalhousie University Faculty of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 04 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 04 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018