THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:32:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pediatrics Associates - Erin Mills
2227 South Millway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-569-9798
Fax: 905-569-8630
Address: 601-3601 Highway 7 E
Unionville Children Clinic
Suite 601
Markham ON L3R 0M3
Phone: 905-940-0112
Fax: 905-940-9271
Address: Milton Pediatrics
101 - 450 Bronte St S
Milton Ontario L9T 8T2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adil Zaidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaidi (CPSO#: 116894 )
Business Address: Pediatric Associates of Erin Mills
2227 South Millway
Suite 301
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
(905) 569-9798

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Pediatrics Associates - Erin Mills
2227 South Millway
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-569-9798
Fax: 905-569-8630
Address: 601-3601 Highway 7 E
Unionville Children Clinic
Suite 601
Markham ON L3R 0M3
Phone: 905-940-0112
Fax: 905-940-9271
Address: Milton Pediatrics
101 - 450 Bronte St S
Milton Ontario L9T 8T2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Credit Valley Hospital
2200 Eglington Ave W
Mississauga Ontario L5M 2N1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 11 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 11 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Oak Valley Health Markham
HOSPITAL: Oak Valley Health
LOCATION: Markham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Adil Zaidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Zaidi (CPSO#: 116894 )
Business Address: Pediatric Associates of Erin Mills
2227 South Millway
Suite 301
Mississauga Ontario L5L 3R6
(905) 569-9798

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADIL HASAN ZAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAIDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADIL HASAN ZAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAIDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2018