THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 03:59:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: 613-241-1971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Moaweya Zayed Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zayed (CPSO#: 116895 )
Business Address: 210 Melrose Ave S
Ottawa ON K1Y 4K7
(613) 761-4334
Business Address: 75 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 241-3344
Fax: 613-241-1971

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Aug 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 31 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Minnesota

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Bruyere Continuing Care Ottawa
Ottawa Hospital Civic Site Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Bruyere Continuing Care
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital Civic Site
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Moaweya Zayed Medical Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Jan 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Zayed (CPSO#: 116895 )
Business Address: 210 Melrose Ave S
Ottawa ON K1Y 4K7
(613) 761-4334
Business Address: 75 Bruyère St
Ottawa ON K1N 5C7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOAWEYA ZAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAYED is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MOAWEYA ZAYED may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ZAYED is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saint James School of Medicine St Vincen, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 04 Sep 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Sep 2018