THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:13:23 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2007
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1A-6975 Meadowvale Town Centre Cir
Mississauga ON L5N 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058124874
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 411 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5B 0J5
Phone: (905) 232-4007
Fax: (647) 689-6499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SABIHA REHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rehan (CPSO#: 116936 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1A-6975 Meadowvale Town Centre Cir
Mississauga ON L5N 2W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9058124874
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 411 Burnhamthorpe Rd W
Mississauga ON L5B 0J5
Phone: (905) 232-4007
Fax: (647) 689-6499

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jun 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Alberta
Pakistan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: SABIHA REHAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 17 Feb 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Rehan (CPSO#: 116936 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABIHA REHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REHAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SABIHA REHAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. REHAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Health Sciences Lahore, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 07 Sep 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Sep 2018