THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:26:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
Niagara Health System - St. Catharines Site
General Internal Medicine
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: 905-684-6411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CARLEY CAMPBELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Campbell (CPSO#: 116947 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1200 Fourth Ave
Niagara Health System - St. Catharines Site
General Internal Medicine
St. Catharines ON L2S 0A9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-378-4647
Fax: 905-684-6411

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site St Catharines
HOSPITAL: Niagara Health System St Catharines General Site
LOCATION: St Catharines

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: CARLEY CAMPBELL MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Aug 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. C. Campbell (CPSO#: 116947 )
Business Address: 1200 Fourth Avenue
St. Catharines Ontario L2S 0A9

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLEY ANNE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. CARLEY ANNE CAMPBELL may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CAMPBELL is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Dec 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Nov 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 28 Jul 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 28 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2018