THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:19:08 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 242 1000
Extension: 22000
Fax: 416 658 2242

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shabnam Hamidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hamidi (CPSO#: 116962 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
North York ON M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1235 Wilson Ave
North York ON M3M 0B2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416 242 1000
Extension: 22000
Fax: 416 658 2242

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Nephrology
Effective: 23 Sep 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Nephrology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 23 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Humber River Hospital Toronto
HOSPITAL: Humber River Hospital
LOCATION: Toronto

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Shabnam Hamidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 May 2023
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hamidi (CPSO#: 116962 )
Business Address: 1235 Wilson Ave
Humber River Hospital
North York ON M3M 0B2
(416) 242-1000

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHABNAM HAMIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMIDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SHABNAM HAMIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HAMIDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McMaster University, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 25 Aug 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 29 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 10 Mar 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 11 Feb 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 25 Aug 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 10 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Feb 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2018