THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
21/05/25 03:11:28 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 280 King Edward Ave
London ON N5Z 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-691-0100
Fax: 226-636-6113
Address: 101-510 Southdale Rd E
Nixon Walk-In Clinic
London ON N6E 0B2
Phone: 519-914-5202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sudan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Khartoum, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 280 King Edward Ave
London ON N5Z 3V3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-691-0100
Fax: 226-636-6113
Address: 101-510 Southdale Rd E
Nixon Walk-In Clinic
London ON N6E 0B2
Phone: 519-914-5202
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Sudan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HISHAM ELMAHDI MUSTAFA ELMAHDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMAHDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. HISHAM ELMAHDI MUSTAFA ELMAHDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ELMAHDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Khartoum, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 25 Mar 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 Nov 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2018