THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:40:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 The Boardwalk
403
Northfield @ Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 896 0070
Fax: 226 896 0071

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Imran Shahzad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Shahzad (CPSO#: 116964 )
Business Address: 435 The Boardwalk
Suite 403
Northfield @ Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
226 896 0070

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 435 The Boardwalk
403
Northfield @ Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226 896 0070
Fax: 226 896 0071

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Imran Shahzad Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. I. Shahzad (CPSO#: 116964 )
Business Address: 435 The Boardwalk
Suite 403
Northfield @ Boardwalk
Waterloo ON N2T 0C2
226 896 0070

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMRAN SHAHZAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHZAD is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. IMRAN SHAHZAD may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SHAHZAD is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of the Punjab, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Oct 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Oct 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 20 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 20 Sep 2018