THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
15/05/25 05:05:29 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Minya, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6870 Goreway Dr
Mississauga ON L4V 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-677-4200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mira Abdelshahid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdelshahid (CPSO#: 116969 )
Business Address: 205 Marycroft Ave
Suite 2
Woodbridge ON L4L 5X8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Minya, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 6870 Goreway Dr
Mississauga ON L4V 1P1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-677-4200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Mira Abdelshahid Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 04 May 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Abdelshahid (CPSO#: 116969 )
Business Address: 205 Marycroft Ave
Suite 2
Woodbridge ON L4L 5X8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRA SAAD FAHMY ABDELSHAHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELSHAHID is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MIRA SAAD FAHMY ABDELSHAHID may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ABDELSHAHID is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Minya, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 12 Jan 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 09 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 21 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 09 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 21 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2018