THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
10/05/25 03:37:04 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Makerere Univ, 2003
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ACHOLI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Regional Health Sciences Centre
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacinta Oyella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oyella (CPSO#: 116970 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ACHOLI
Medical School: Makerere Univ, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Regional Health Sciences Centre
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (807) 684-6030
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre Sioux Lookout
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Sioux Lookout Meno-Ya-Win Health Centre
LOCATION: Sioux Lookout

HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jacinta Oyella Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Jan 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Oyella (CPSO#: 116970 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Rd
Thunder Bay ON P7B 6V4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACINTA OYELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYELLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JACINTA OYELLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. OYELLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Makerere Univ, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Mar 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 24 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Mar 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 24 Sep 2018