THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 04:30:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Misr University for Science & Technology, 2011
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 3-450 Hume Street
Office of Dr Tawfik & Associates
Marsden Wellness Centre
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-556-2435
Fax: 647-417-7176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Mar 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rasha Tawfik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tawfik (CPSO#: 116992 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Misr University for Science & Technology, 2011

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: unit 3-450 Hume Street
Office of Dr Tawfik & Associates
Marsden Wellness Centre
Collingwood Ontario L9Y 1W6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-556-2435
Fax: 647-417-7176

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 02 Mar 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 02 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Rasha Tawfik Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Oct 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. R. Tawfik (CPSO#: 116992 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHA HANY MOUNIR ZAKI TAWFIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAWFIK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. RASHA HANY MOUNIR ZAKI TAWFIK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TAWFIK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Misr University for Science & Technology, 2011

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 05 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 05 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Sep 2018