THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 04:38:13 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2007
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Hansom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hansom (CPSO#: 116995 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2007

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 22 Sep 2021
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 22 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Simon Hansom Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 31 Aug 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Hansom (CPSO#: 116995 )
Business Address: 40 Ruskin St
Ottawa ON K1Y 4W7

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
22 Sep 2021
31 Aug 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 22 2021
EXPIRY DATE: Aug 31 2024
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SIMON PETER HANSOM may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology at the University of Ottawa, in which Dr. HANSOM holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. HANSOM no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. HANSOM’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. HANSOM’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 22 September, 2021, and expires on 21 September, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. HANSOM's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. SIMON PETER HANSOM may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Cardiology at the University of Ottawa, in which Dr. HANSOM holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. HANSOM no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. HANSOM’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. HANSOM’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 22 September, 2021, and expires on 21 September, 2028. Upon renewal of Dr. HANSOM's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of East Anglia, 2007

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 21 Sep 2028
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 22 Sep 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Sep 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 26 Nov 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 01 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 21 Sep 2028

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Sep 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Nov 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Oct 2018