THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:59:12 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Garyounis University, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1130 Barton Street East
Premium Cardiac Centre, Unit 201
Hamilton Ontario L8H 7P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2893895777
Fax: 2893891688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asem Suliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Suliman (CPSO#: 117022 )
Business Address: 227-80 Maritime Ontario Blvd
Brampton ON L6S 0E7

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: Garyounis University, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1130 Barton Street East
Premium Cardiac Centre, Unit 201
Hamilton Ontario L8H 7P9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 2893895777
Fax: 2893891688

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 19 Oct 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Joseph Brant Hospital Burlington
HOSPITAL: Joseph Brant Hospital
LOCATION: Burlington

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Asem Suliman Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Suliman (CPSO#: 117022 )
Business Address: 227-80 Maritime Ontario Blvd
Brampton ON L6S 0E7

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASEM S M SULIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULIMAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ASEM S M SULIMAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SULIMAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Garyounis University, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 15 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 09 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 13 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 15 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 09 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Dec 2018