THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:49:44 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-10425 Kennedy Rd
Suite 101
Brampton ON L6Z 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 846-7611
Fax: (905) 846-7753
Address: The Health Centre of Maple
2810 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple Ontario L6A 3L2
Phone: 905-832-3838
Fax: 905-832-9097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jan 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aakash Modi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Modi (CPSO#: 117044 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-10425 Kennedy Rd
Suite 101
Brampton ON L6Z 0A4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 846-7611
Fax: (905) 846-7753
Address: The Health Centre of Maple
2810 Major Mackenzie Dr
Maple Ontario L6A 3L2
Phone: 905-832-3838
Fax: 905-832-9097

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 16 Jan 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 16 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - North Carolina

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aakash Modi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 09 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Modi (CPSO#: 117044 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AAKASH MODI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MODI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AAKASH MODI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MODI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Jan 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 22 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 22 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018