THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:15:34 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2005
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-125 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-5261
Fax: 705-728-5265

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gboyega Famodimu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Famodimu (CPSO#: 117047 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2005

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1-125 Bell Farm Rd
Barrie ON L4M 6L2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 705-728-5261
Fax: 705-728-5265

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Apr 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Gboyega Famodimu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jan 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. G. Famodimu (CPSO#: 117047 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
26 Jan 2023
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 26 2023
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GBOYEGA AYODEJI FAMODIMU may practise medicine independently in family medicine.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. GBOYEGA AYODEJI FAMODIMU may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2005

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 26 Jan 2023
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 31 Aug 2022
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 09 Sep 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 May 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 25 Mar 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 26 Jan 2023

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 31 Aug 2022

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 09 Sep 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 May 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 25 Mar 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018