THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
02/05/25 04:51:06 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3775 Kingston Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 238-8135
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Uzma Syeda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Syeda (CPSO#: 117050 )
Business Address: 3775 Kingston Road
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3H4
(416) 238-8135

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, URDU
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 3775 Kingston Rd
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3H4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (416) 238-8135
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 27 Sep 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 27 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Uzma Syeda Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 23 Nov 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. U. Syeda (CPSO#: 117050 )
Business Address: 3775 Kingston Road
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3H4
(416) 238-8135

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UZMA NAAZ SYEDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYEDA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. UZMA NAAZ SYEDA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. SYEDA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018