THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:38:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Tichreen, 2003
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario (CHEO)
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +16137377600
Extension: 2415
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Tichreen, 2003

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 401 Smyth Road
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario (CHEO)
Ottawa Ontario K1H 8L1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: +16137377600
Extension: 2415
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Pediatrics
Effective: 08 Nov 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Pediatrics
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 08 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Ottawa Hospital Ottawa
Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Ottawa Hospital
LOCATION: Ottawa

HOSPITAL: Children's Hospital of Eastern Ontario
LOCATION: Ottawa

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
08 Nov 2022
30 Sep 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 08 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Sep 30 2025
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AYMAN SAKER may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. SAKER holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SAKER no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SAKER’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SAKER’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 November, 2022, and expires on 30 September, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. SAKER's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. AYMAN SAKER may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Pediatrics, Division of Neonatology, University of Ottawa, in which Dr. SAKER holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. SAKER no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. SAKER’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. SAKER’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 08 November, 2022, and expires on 30 September, 2025. Upon renewal of Dr. SAKER's academic appointment at the University of Ottawa, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Tichreen, 2003

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 08 Nov 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 07 Nov 2022
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 02 Aug 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 01 Aug 2021
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 08 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 08 Nov 2022
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Sep 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 07 Nov 2022

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 01 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Oct 2018