THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:09:31 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197494300
Extension: 3892
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Babak Allie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Allie (CPSO#: 117058 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 3892

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Emergency Department
Grand River Hospital
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5197494300
Extension: 3892
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Emergency Medicine
Effective: 04 May 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Emergency Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 04 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Grand River Hospital Corporation Kitchener
St Mary's General Hospital Kitchener
HOSPITAL: Grand River Hospital Corporation
LOCATION: Kitchener

HOSPITAL: St Mary's General Hospital
LOCATION: Kitchener

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Babak Allie Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Jul 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Allie (CPSO#: 117058 )
Business Address: Grand River Hospital
Emergency Department
835 King Street West
Kitchener Ontario N2G 1G3
(519) 749-4300 Extn: 3892

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BABAK ALLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLIE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BABAK ALLIE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ALLIE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 1992

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 03 Oct 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Oct 2018