THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
23/05/25 05:08:18 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Obstetrics and
Gynecology
699 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 08 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SARAH J. MAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mah (CPSO#: 117113 )
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
905-387-9495 Extn: 64801

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: HHS Juravinski Cancer Centre
Division of Obstetrics and
Gynecology
699 Concession St
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 387-9495
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gynecologic Oncology
Effective: 08 Sep 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Obstetrics and Gynecology
Effective: 01 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gynecologic Oncology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 08 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Obstetrics and Gynecology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. SARAH J. MAH MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Mah (CPSO#: 117113 )
Business Address: 699 Concession Street
Division of Gynecologic Oncology
Hamilton Ontario L8V 5C2
905-387-9495 Extn: 64801

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH JILL MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. SARAH JILL MAH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MAH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of British Columbia Faculty of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Jun 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 16 Dec 2018
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 19 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Jun 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2018

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Nov 2018