THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 00:06:48 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2018
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 785 Wonderland Rd S
Unit 254
London ON N6K 1M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-272-0272
Fax: 519-601-6288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DANIEL CHADWICK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chadwick (CPSO#: 117116 )
Business Address: 254-785 Wonderland Rd S
London ON N6K 1M6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 785 Wonderland Rd S
Unit 254
London ON N6K 1M6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 226-272-0272
Fax: 519-601-6288

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DANIEL CHADWICK MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 08 Sep 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. D. Chadwick (CPSO#: 117116 )
Business Address: 254-785 Wonderland Rd S
London ON N6K 1M6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL RICHARD CHADWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADWICK is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. DANIEL RICHARD CHADWICK may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHADWICK is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: National University of Ireland, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 29 Apr 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 23 Feb 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Oct 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 23 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Apr 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2021
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 23 Feb 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Oct 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Oct 2018