THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:32:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1998
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suit 17-951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-948-8895
Fax: 431-317-0636
Address: Unit 17
951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 2A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Behzad Mansouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mansouri (CPSO#: 117143 )
Business Address: 500 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 848-0001
Business Address: Brain Vision Concussion Clinic-Toronto
Suit 17
6479488895

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1998

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: suit 17-951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 2A7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 647-948-8895
Fax: 431-317-0636
Address: Unit 17
951 Wilson Avenue
Toronto Ontario M3K 2A7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Neurology
Effective: 30 Jun 2012
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Neurology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2012
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Behzad Mansouri Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Dec 2018
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Mansouri (CPSO#: 117143 )
Business Address: 500 - 89 Queensway West
Mississauga Ontario L5B 2V2
(905) 848-0001
Business Address: Brain Vision Concussion Clinic-Toronto
Suit 17
6479488895

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHZAD MANSOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOURI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BEHZAD MANSOURI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MANSOURI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Tehran University of Medical Sciences, 1998

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Jul 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 02 Jul 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jul 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Oct 2018