THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 05:33:24 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8405 Financial Drive
Unit 7
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-846-2299
Fax: 289-720-2074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ZAHID MAHMOOD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Mahmood (CPSO#: 117167 )
Business Address: 106 Victoria St W
Upper Main
Alliston ON L9R 1Y7
705-435-0077
Business Address: 7-8405 Financial Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 1M1
905-846-2299

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, PANJABI/PUNJABI, URDU
Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 8405 Financial Drive
Unit 7
Brampton Ontario L6Y 0E3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-846-2299
Fax: 289-720-2074

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 05 Nov 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 05 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: ZAHID MAHMOOD MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 30 Nov 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. Z. Mahmood (CPSO#: 117167 )
Business Address: 106 Victoria St W
Upper Main
Alliston ON L9R 1Y7
705-435-0077
Business Address: 7-8405 Financial Dr
Brampton ON L6Y 1M1
905-846-2299

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Mar 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 12 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Zahid Mahmood may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. Zahid Mahmood may practise medicine independently in family medicine.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Saba University School of Medicine, 2015

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 22 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 05 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 22 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 05 Nov 2018