THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:37:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1487 Simcoe St N
Simcoe Medical Center
unit #1
Oshawa ON L1G 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052407621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-133 King St E
King Street Medical Center
Bowmanville ON L1C 1N6
Phone: 9054190110
Fax: 9054190204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Princewill Chikezie Uju Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Uju (CPSO#: 117170 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1487 Simcoe St N
Simcoe Medical Center
unit #1
Oshawa ON L1G 4X8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9052407621
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-133 King St E
King Street Medical Center
Bowmanville ON L1C 1N6
Phone: 9054190110
Fax: 9054190204

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 07 Dec 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 07 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Princewill Chikezie Uju Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 20 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Uju (CPSO#: 117170 )

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRINCEWILL CHIKEZIE UJU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UJU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PRINCEWILL CHIKEZIE UJU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. UJU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 26 Sep 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Sep 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 29 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Sep 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 29 Oct 2018