THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:07:52 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine Cent
2535 Major MacKenzie Dr
Maple Ontario L6A 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-303-0760
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine Cent
72 Copper Creek Dr
Markham Ontario L6B 0P2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine
Centre - Mississauga
2021 Cliff Rd
Mississauga Ontario L5A 3N7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine
Centres - Yorkville
222-162 Cumberland St
Toronto Ontario M5R 3A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine Cent
11 King St W
Toronto Ontario M5H 4C7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 604-1 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON M4P 3A1
Phone: 416-485-0555
Fax: 416-485-2555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 01 Nov 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Borna Kavousi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kavousi (CPSO#: 117177 )

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine Cent
2535 Major MacKenzie Dr
Maple Ontario L6A 1C6
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905-303-0760
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine Cent
72 Copper Creek Dr
Markham Ontario L6B 0P2
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine
Centre - Mississauga
2021 Cliff Rd
Mississauga Ontario L5A 3N7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine
Centres - Yorkville
222-162 Cumberland St
Toronto Ontario M5R 3A8
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Athlete's Care Sports Medicine Cent
11 King St W
Toronto Ontario M5H 4C7
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 604-1 Eglinton Ave E
Toronto ON M4P 3A1
Phone: 416-485-0555
Fax: 416-485-2555

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
Effective: 01 Nov 2018
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Physical Medicine and Rehabilitation
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 01 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - New York

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Borna Kavousi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 28 Nov 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Kavousi (CPSO#: 117177 )

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
12 Nov 2020
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Nov 12 2020
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. BORNA KAVOUSI may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and rehabilitation.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. BORNA KAVOUSI may practise medicine independently in physical medicine and rehabilitation.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: St. George's University School of Medicine, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 12 Nov 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 14 Nov 2019
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 14 Nov 2019

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Nov 2018