THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
29/04/25 06:39:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 114 - 704 Mara St
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194912660
Fax: 5197041010

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nassar Al-Zubaidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Al-Zubaidi (CPSO#: 117190 )
Business Address: 114 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
(226) 778-7827
Business Address: 704 Mara Street
Suite 114
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
5194912660

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 114 - 704 Mara St
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 5194912660
Fax: 5197041010

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Respirology
Effective: 19 Oct 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 02 Jun 2016
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Respirology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 19 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 02 2016
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
USA - Michigan

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
Bluewater Health Sarnia
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

HOSPITAL: Bluewater Health
LOCATION: Sarnia

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Nassar Al-Zubaidi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Mar 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. N. Al-Zubaidi (CPSO#: 117190 )
Business Address: 114 - 704 Mara Street
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
(226) 778-7827
Business Address: 704 Mara Street
Suite 114
Point Edward Ontario N7V 1X4
5194912660

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASSAR AL-ZUBAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ZUBAIDI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. NASSAR AL-ZUBAIDI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AL-ZUBAIDI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Damascus Faculty of Medicine, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 02 Nov 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Nov 2018