THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 04:47:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 372 Lacroix Street
Unit B
Chatham Ontario N7M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-397-0623
Fax: 519-397-4123

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Fehr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fehr (CPSO#: 117207 )
Business Address: 146 Queen Street
Unit B
Chatham Ontario N7M 2G6
(519) 397-0623
Business Address: 372 Lacroix Street
B
Chatham Ontario N7M 2W3

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 372 Lacroix Street
Unit B
Chatham Ontario N7M 2W3
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 519-397-0623
Fax: 519-397-4123

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 09 Sep 2020
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Chatham-Kent Health Alliance Chatham
HOSPITAL: Chatham-Kent Health Alliance
LOCATION: Chatham

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Adam Fehr Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 13 Aug 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Fehr (CPSO#: 117207 )
Business Address: 146 Queen Street
Unit B
Chatham Ontario N7M 2G6
(519) 397-0623
Business Address: 372 Lacroix Street
B
Chatham Ontario N7M 2W3

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM WILLIAM FEHR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEHR is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ADAM WILLIAM FEHR may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. FEHR is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Schulich School of Medicine and Dentistry, Western University, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 28 Nov 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 11 Jun 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 16 Dec 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 24 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 11 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 16 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 24 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2018