THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
16/05/25 05:51:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1990
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Rd
807 684 6000
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807 684 6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Atawneh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Al-Atawneh (CPSO#: 117213 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5N3
(807) 345-3355

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Thunder Bay Regional
Health Sciences Centre
980 Oliver Rd
807 684 6000
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 807 684 6000
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Cardiology
Effective: 01 Jan 2020
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 01 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre Thunder Bay
HOSPITAL: Thunder Bay Regional Health Sciences Centre
LOCATION: Thunder Bay

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Al-Atawneh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 Feb 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Al-Atawneh (CPSO#: 117213 )
Business Address: 980 Oliver Road
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 6V4
(807) 684-6000
Business Address: 1165 Barton Street
Thunder Bay Ontario P7B 5N3
(807) 345-3355

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
16 Jan 2025
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Jan 16 2025
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JAMAL NAWAF SULEIMAN AL-ATAWNEH may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. JAMAL NAWAF SULEIMAN AL-ATAWNEH may practise medicine independently in internal medicine and cardiology.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Jordan Faculty of Medicine, 1990

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 16 Jan 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Dec 2019
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 03 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 16 Jan 2025

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jan 2020
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2026

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Dec 2019

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 03 Dec 2018