THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
22/05/25 05:03:50 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 608 5044
Fax: 905 608 5042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BELLAL JUBRAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Jubran (CPSO#: 117217 )
Business Address: 208-2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, ARABIC
Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 208-2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 905 608 5044
Fax: 905 608 5042

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Gastroenterology
Effective: 29 Nov 2022
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Gastroenterology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 29 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Trillium Health Partners Mississauga
Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital Mississauga
HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners
LOCATION: Mississauga

HOSPITAL: Trillium Health Partners The Credit Valley Hospital
LOCATION: Mississauga

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. BELLAL JUBRAN MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 06 Jun 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. B. Jubran (CPSO#: 117217 )
Business Address: 208-2300 Eglinton Ave W
Mississauga ON L5M 2V8
Business Address: 100 Queensway W
Mississauga ON L5B 1B8

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BELLAL BASSAM ALI JUBRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUBRAN is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. BELLAL BASSAM ALI JUBRAN may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. JUBRAN is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: McGill University Faculty of Medicine and Health Sciences, 2017

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Aug 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 02 Jun 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 08 Apr 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 13 Jan 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 17 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Aug 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 02 Jun 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 08 Apr 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 13 Jan 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Dec 2018