THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:39:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Medical University Sofia, 2002
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-380 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138014380
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS Records Storage and Retreival
111 St Regis Cr S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 01 Sep 2021

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. STANISLAV TERZIEV MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Terziev (CPSO#: 117225 )
Business Address: 101-380 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, BULGARIAN
Medical School: Medical University Sofia, 2002

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 101-380 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 6138014380
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 30 Nov 2018
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Nov 30 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Records Location

Instructions/Address: RSRS Records Storage and Retreival
111 St Regis Cr S
North York, ON
M3J 1Y6
Date Received: 01 Sep 2021

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital Carleton Place
HOSPITAL: Carleton Place & District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Carleton Place

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. STANISLAV TERZIEV MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 10 Sep 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. S. Terziev (CPSO#: 117225 )
Business Address: 101-380 Hunt Club Rd
Ottawa ON K1V 1C1

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STANISLAV SASHEV TERZIEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERZIEV is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. STANISLAV SASHEV TERZIEV may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. TERZIEV is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Medical University Sofia, 2002

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 30 May 2019
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 30 May 2019

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Nov 2018