THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:03:00 AM

General Information

Former Name: Kanungo, Aneesha (Used Until: 31 Oct 2017)
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Fairview Mall Drive
Unit 405
Toronto Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164945634
Fax: 4166236524
Address: MCI The Doctor's Office
Woodbridge
700 - 200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 9L3
Phone: (905) 856-2100
Fax: (905) 856-2101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Mar 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aneesha Bakshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bakshi (CPSO#: 117233 )
Business Address: A4-800 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7L2

General Information

Former Name: Kanungo, Aneesha (Used Until: 31 Oct 2017)
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Leicester, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 5 Fairview Mall Drive
Unit 405
Toronto Ontario M2J 2Z1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 4164945634
Fax: 4166236524
Address: MCI The Doctor's Office
Woodbridge
700 - 200 Windflower Gate
Woodbridge Ontario L4L 9L3
Phone: (905) 856-2100
Fax: (905) 856-2101

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 31 Mar 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 31 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Aneesha Bakshi Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 25 Mar 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. A. Bakshi (CPSO#: 117233 )
Business Address: A4-800 Steeles Ave W
Thornhill ON L4J 7L2

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANEESHA BAKSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKSHI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. ANEESHA BAKSHI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. BAKSHI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Leicester, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 26 Oct 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 15 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 26 Oct 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 15 Nov 2018