THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
05/05/25 03:21:14 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Mysore, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Endoscopy
10886 Hurontario St
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 495-5200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghori Mulla Suppal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suppal (CPSO#: 65159 ) Dr. A. MULLA (CPSO#: 117247 ) Dr. A. Ghori (CPSO#: 105577 )
Business Address: Shoppers World Medical Centre
144 - 499 Main Street South
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1N7
(905) 796-6570

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, HINDI, KANNADA, URDU
Medical School: University of Mysore, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Brampton Endoscopy
10886 Hurontario St
Brampton Ontario L7A 3R9
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 495-5200
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
General Surgery
Effective: 19 Jun 2013
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: General Surgery
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 19 2013
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Saskatchewan

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Ghori Mulla Suppal Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 22 Jun 2010
Shareholders:
Dr. P. Suppal (CPSO#: 65159 ) Dr. A. MULLA (CPSO#: 117247 ) Dr. A. Ghori (CPSO#: 105577 )
Business Address: Shoppers World Medical Centre
144 - 499 Main Street South
Brampton Ontario L6Y 1N7
(905) 796-6570

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMITH AHAMED MULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. AMITH AHAMED MULLA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MULLA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Mysore, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2018
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2018