THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:51:56 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Liaquat Medical College, 1993
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11615 McVean Drive
Brampton Ontario L6P 4N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055135511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markington Family Care
and Walk in Clinic
143 - 144 3227 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3M5
Phone: (416) 261-4446
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Apr 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Faryal Ashraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ashraf (CPSO#: 117255 )
Business Address: 12 Parr Boulevard
Unit 3
Bolton Ontario L7E 4G9
9058402254
Business Address: 3227 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1J 3M5
4162614446

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, URDU
Medical School: Liaquat Medical College, 1993

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 11615 McVean Drive
Brampton Ontario L6P 4N5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9055135511
Fax: No Information Available
Address: Markington Family Care
and Walk in Clinic
143 - 144 3227 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough Ontario M1J 3M5
Phone: (416) 261-4446
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 29 Apr 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Apr 29 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr Faryal Ashraf Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 12 Apr 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. F. Ashraf (CPSO#: 117255 )
Business Address: 12 Parr Boulevard
Unit 3
Bolton Ontario L7E 4G9
9058402254
Business Address: 3227 Eglinton Ave E
Scarborough ON M1J 3M5
4162614446

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARYAL ASHRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHRAF is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. FARYAL ASHRAF may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. ASHRAF is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Liaquat Medical College, 1993

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 13 Mar 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 13 Mar 2020
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 20 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 28 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 13 Mar 2020

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 20 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 28 Nov 2018