THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 05:07:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2004
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-311 Fruitland Road
Stoney Creek Ontario L8E 5M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-649-1682
Fax: 289-649-1683

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marwan Matti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matti (CPSO#: 117282 )
Business Address: Fletcher Medical Clinic
1962 Rymal Road East
Hamilton Ontario L0R 1P0
(905) 692-6060

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, ARABIC
Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2004

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 2-311 Fruitland Road
Stoney Creek Ontario L8E 5M8
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 289-649-1682
Fax: 289-649-1683

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Jan 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Marwan Matti Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 18 Apr 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Matti (CPSO#: 117282 )
Business Address: Fletcher Medical Clinic
1962 Rymal Road East
Hamilton Ontario L0R 1P0
(905) 692-6060

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARWAN HIKMAT MATTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MARWAN HIKMAT MATTI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. MATTI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Al-Mustansiriyah College of Medicine, 2004

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2021
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 27 Jun 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 27 Jun 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2018
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2018