THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:00:03 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Samys Family Clilnic
847 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 545-9807
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AKERELE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akerele (CPSO#: 117352 )
Business Address: 847 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 3B4

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Samys Family Clilnic
847 Barton St E
Hamilton Ontario L8L 3B4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 545-9807
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 03 May 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: May 03 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - New Brunswick
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: AKERELE MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 26 Apr 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. O. Akerele (CPSO#: 117352 )
Business Address: 847 Barton St E
Hamilton ON L8L 3B4

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLAYINKA AYODEJI AKERELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKERELE is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. OLAYINKA AYODEJI AKERELE may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. AKERELE is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ibadan College of Medicine, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 14 May 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 02 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 14 May 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 02 Jan 2019