THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 04:52:10 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Dundee, 2010
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 398 Royal York Rd
Etobicoke ON M8Y 2R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-201-0836
Fax: 416-259-0184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Feb 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuisma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuisma (CPSO#: 117368 )
Business Address: 398 Royal York Rd
Etobicoke ON M8Y 2R5

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Dundee, 2010

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 398 Royal York Rd
Etobicoke ON M8Y 2R5
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 416-201-0836
Fax: 416-259-0184

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 08 Feb 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Feb 08 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Kuisma Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 07 Oct 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Kuisma (CPSO#: 117368 )
Business Address: 398 Royal York Rd
Etobicoke ON M8Y 2R5

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE KAREN KUISMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUISMA is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MICHELLE KAREN KUISMA may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KUISMA is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Dundee, 2010

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 22 Dec 2021
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 22 Dec 2021

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2019