THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
04/05/25 04:56:15 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Sana'a, 2009
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology and
Hematology
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Hematology
Effective: 01 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Sana'a, 2009

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: UHN Princess Margaret Cancer Centre
Division of Medical Oncology and
Hematology
610 University Ave
Toronto Ontario M5G 2C1
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Internal Medicine
Effective: 01 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
Hematology
Effective: 01 Mar 2025
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

SPECIALTY: Hematology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Mar 01 2025
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
01 Mar 2025
29 Feb 2032
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 01 2025
EXPIRY DATE: Feb 29 2032
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ESHRAK MOHAMMED RADMAN KAYED AL-SHAIBANI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Hematology, at the University of Toronto, in which Dr. AL-SHAIBANI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. AL-SHAIBANI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. AL-SHAIBANI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. AL-SHAIBANI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2025. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 29 February, 2032.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. ESHRAK MOHAMMED RADMAN KAYED AL-SHAIBANI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Hematology, at the University of Toronto, in which Dr. AL-SHAIBANI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of their academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. AL-SHAIBANI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. AL-SHAIBANI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. AL-SHAIBANI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 01 March, 2025. In accordance with paragraphs 2 and 3 above, this certificate will, if not extended by the Registration Committee, automatically expire on 29 February, 2032.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Sana'a, 2009

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Mar 2025
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2024
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2024
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 07 Mar 2019
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Feb 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 04 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2025
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Mar 2025
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 29 Feb 2032

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2024
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration by Registration Committee.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2024

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2019

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Feb 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 04 Jan 2019