THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 05:16:26 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 1994
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
London ON N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 19 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rahimi Shahmirzadi (CPSO#: 117381 )
Business Address: PO Box 5777 Stn B
London ON N6A 4V2
519-646-6417

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St. Joseph's Hospital
268 Grosvenor St
London ON N6A 4V2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Infectious Diseases
Effective: 19 Sep 2022
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Infectious Diseases
ISSUED ON: Effective: Sep 19 2022
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 19 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Rahimi Shahmirzadi (CPSO#: 117381 )
Business Address: PO Box 5777 Stn B
London ON N6A 4V2
519-646-6417

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
19 Sep 2022
30 Jun 2027
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Sep 19 2022
EXPIRY DATE: Jun 30 2027
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MOHAMMADREZA RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Infectious Diseases, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 September, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
1. Dr. MOHAMMADREZA RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI may practise medicine only,

(i) in a setting that is approved by the Chair, Department of Medicine, Division of Infectious Diseases, University of Western Ontario, in which Dr. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI holds an academic appointment at the rank of Assistant Professor, and

(ii) in accordance with the requirements of his academic appointment.

2. The certificate of registration automatically expires seven years from the date of issuance or when Dr. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI no longer holds the academic appointment in accordance with clause 1, whichever comes first.

3. The certificate of registration automatically expires upon the following events, unless the Registration Committee renews the certificate with or without additional or other terms, conditions and limitations:

(i) the College receives a report indicating that Dr. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI’s clinical performance, knowledge, skill, judgment, professional conduct, or academic progress is unsatisfactory, or

(ii) the Committee does not receive an annual report or receives a report that is unsatisfactory in form or content, or

(iii) when the Committee makes a decision about Dr. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI’s certificate of registration, following consideration of the practice assessment report.

Note: This certificate is issued on 19 September, 2022, and expires on 30 June, 2027. Upon renewal of Dr. RAHIMI SHAHMIRZADI's academic appointment at the University of Western Ontario, the expiry date can be extended, subject to the limitations in paragraphs 2 and 3 above.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Shahid Beheshti University of Medical Sciences Faculty of Medicine, 1994

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2027
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 19 Sep 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Jun 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Jun 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 May 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 May 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Apr 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Apr 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Mar 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Mar 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 18 Feb 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 17 Feb 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 19 Jan 2022
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 18 Jan 2022
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 20 Dec 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 19 Dec 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 23 Nov 2021
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 22 Nov 2021
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 30 Jun 2020
Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 27 Mar 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate Effective: 07 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2027

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2022
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 19 Sep 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Jun 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 May 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 May 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Apr 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Mar 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 17 Feb 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 19 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 18 Jan 2022

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 20 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 19 Dec 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 23 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 22 Nov 2021

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Short Duration Supervised Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 30 Jun 2020

DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 27 Mar 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Pre Entry Assessment Program Certificate
Date: Effective: 07 Jan 2019