THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
07/05/25 04:15:53 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2008
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 7090
Fax: (613) 761-3602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Habibollahzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Habibollahzadeh (CPSO#: 117423 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 7090

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2008

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Royal Ottawa Mental Health Centre
1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa Ontario K1Z 7K4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (613) 722-6521
Extension: 7090
Fax: (613) 761-3602

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 24 Aug 2018
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Aug 24 2018
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Iran

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Royal Ottawa Health Care Group Ottawa
HOSPITAL: Royal Ottawa Health Care Group
LOCATION: Ottawa

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: E. Habibollahzadeh Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 01 Dec 2022
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Habibollahzadeh (CPSO#: 117423 )
Business Address: 1145 Carling Ave
Ottawa ON K1Z 7K4
(613) 722-6521 Extn: 7090

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EBAD HABIBOLLAHZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIBOLLAHZADEH is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EBAD HABIBOLLAHZADEH may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. HABIBOLLAHZADEH is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: SHAHEED BEHESHTI UNIVERSITY, 2008

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 11 Jan 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 11 Jan 2019