THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 05:19:19 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Woodview Medical Clinic and Walk-In
3419 Fairview St
Burlington ON L7N 2R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JULIA DI GIOVANNI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Di Giovanni (CPSO#: 117425 )
Business Address: 3419 Fairview St
Clinic
Family Medicine
Burlington ON L7N 2R4
9056816640

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Woman
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: Woodview Medical Clinic and Walk-In
3419 Fairview St
Burlington ON L7N 2R4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 09 Dec 2020
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 09 2020
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: DR. JULIA DI GIOVANNI MEDICINE PROFESSIONAL CORPORATION
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 15 Dec 2021
Shareholders:
Dr. J. Di Giovanni (CPSO#: 117425 )
Business Address: 3419 Fairview St
Clinic
Family Medicine
Burlington ON L7N 2R4
9056816640

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA DI GIOVANNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI GIOVANNI is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. JULIA DI GIOVANNI may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DI GIOVANNI is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Royal College of Surgeons in Ireland School of Medicine, 2018

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Dec 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 31 Jan 2020
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 06 Jan 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 12 Apr 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 18 Mar 2019
DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Dec 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 31 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 06 Jan 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 12 Apr 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 18 Mar 2019