THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
01/05/25 03:56:46 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2006
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 - 77 Hunter St E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056670290
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-1142 Wilson St W
Ancaster ON L9G 3K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5-195 Henry St
Brantford ON N3S 5C9
Phone: 289) 389-3748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 303-720 Guelph Line
Burlington ON L7R 4E2
Phone: 289) 389-3748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 672 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
Phone: 2893893748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 272 Oxford St W
London ON N6H 1S9
Phone: 2893893748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 96 Niagara St
St. Catharines ON L2R 4L4
Phone: 289) 389-3748
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emmanuel Kanu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kanu (CPSO#: 117434 )
Business Address: 75 - 77 Hunter Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1M4
(905) 667-0290

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2006

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 75 - 77 Hunter St E
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1M4
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056670290
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 4-1142 Wilson St W
Ancaster ON L9G 3K9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 5-195 Henry St
Brantford ON N3S 5C9
Phone: 289) 389-3748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 303-720 Guelph Line
Burlington ON L7R 4E2
Phone: 289) 389-3748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 672 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 2H3
Phone: 2893893748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: A-51 Benton St
Kitchener ON N2G 3H1
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 272 Oxford St W
London ON N6H 1S9
Phone: 2893893748
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 96 Niagara St
St. Catharines ON L2R 4L4
Phone: 289) 389-3748
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 11 Jan 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 11 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
United Kingdom

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Emmanuel Kanu Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 05 Feb 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. E. Kanu (CPSO#: 117434 )
Business Address: 75 - 77 Hunter Street East
Hamilton Ontario L8N 1M4
(905) 667-0290

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL IKECHUKWU KANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANU is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. EMMANUEL IKECHUKWU KANU may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KANU is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Nigeria, 2006

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 17 Jan 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 17 Jan 2019