THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
20/05/25 04:42:20 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Fundacao Universidade Federal De Pelotas, 2012
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, PORTUGUESE

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Mood Disorders Progarm
Room C111
100 West 5th St
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 39159
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 25 Jan 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH, GERMAN, PORTUGUESE
Medical School: Fundacao Universidade Federal De Pelotas, 2012

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
Mood Disorders Progarm
Room C111
100 West 5th St
Hamilton Ontario L8N 3K7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 522-1155
Extension: 39159
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Psychiatry
Effective: 25 Jan 2019
College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario
SPECIALTY: Psychiatry
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jan 25 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Physicians and Surgeons of Ontario

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton Hamilton
HOSPITAL: St Joseph's Healthcare Hamilton
LOCATION: Hamilton

Practice Conditions

IMPOSED BY EFFECTIVE DATE EXPIRY DATE STATUS
Registration Committee
07 Mar 2024
Restricted
IMPOSED BY: Registration Committee
EFFECTIVE DATE: Mar 07 2024
EXPIRY DATE:
STATUS: Restricted
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
A physician who has a restricted licence must follow specific terms and conditions in their practice.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MAIKO ABEL SCHNEIDER may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
Dr. MAIKO ABEL SCHNEIDER may practise medicine independently in Psychiatry.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Fundacao Universidade Federal De Pelotas, 2012

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee. Effective: 07 Mar 2024
Expiry date attached to certificate of registration. Expiry: 30 Jun 2025
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 25 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions amended by Registration Committee.
Date: Effective: 07 Mar 2024

DETAILS: Expiry date attached to certificate of registration.
Date: Expiry: 30 Jun 2025

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 25 Jan 2019