THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
06/05/25 08:46:51 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 512A Main Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-774-0915
Fax: 613-774-0916
Address: 566 Louise st
Winchester Ontario K0C2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jolin-Dahel De Moissac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jolin-Dahel (CPSO#: 117311 ) Dr. P. de Moissac (CPSO#: 117486 )
Business Address: 512 Main St
Suite A
Winchester ON K0C2K0
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FRENCH
Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 512A Main Street
Winchester Ontario K0C 2K0
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 613-774-0915
Fax: 613-774-0916
Address: 566 Louise st
Winchester Ontario K0C2K0
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 26 Jun 2015
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 26 2015
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Medical Licences In Other Jurisdictions

Effective September 1, 2015, the College by-laws require the College to indicate on the register if the member has a licence or is registered to practise medicine in a jurisdiction outside Ontario, if this is known to the College.
Canada - Manitoba

Hospital Privileges

HOSPITAL LOCATION
Winchester District Memorial Hospital Winchester
HOSPITAL: Winchester District Memorial Hospital
LOCATION: Winchester

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Jolin-Dahel De Moissac Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 24 Sep 2020
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Jolin-Dahel (CPSO#: 117311 ) Dr. P. de Moissac (CPSO#: 117486 )
Business Address: 512 Main St
Suite A
Winchester ON K0C2K0
Business Address: 566 Louise St
Winchester ON K0C 2K0

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE GEORGES DE MOISSAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MOISSAC is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. PIERRE GEORGES DE MOISSAC may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. DE MOISSAC is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Ottawa, 2013

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 30 Jan 2019
DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 30 Jan 2019