THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
08/05/25 03:32:49 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2016
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 460 Brant Street
Medisen Clinic
suite 203
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Phone: 2897450051
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kimesh Chetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chetty (CPSO#: 117514 )
Business Address: suite 201-460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH
Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: 1245 Lakeshore Road
Joseph Brant Hospital
Burlington Ontario L7S 0A2
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: 9056323737
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 460 Brant Street
Medisen Clinic
suite 203
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6
Phone: 2897450051
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 711 Concession St
Hamilton ON L8V 1C3
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Cardiology
Effective: 23 Oct 2023
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
Internal Medicine
Effective: 30 Jun 2021
Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada
SPECIALTY: Cardiology
ISSUED ON: Effective: Oct 23 2023
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

SPECIALTY: Internal Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Jun 30 2021
CERTIFYING BODY: Royal College of Physicians and Surgeons of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Dr. Kimesh Chetty Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 14 Nov 2024
Shareholders:
Dr. K. Chetty (CPSO#: 117514 )
Business Address: suite 201-460 Brant Street
Burlington Ontario L7R 4B6

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMESH CHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHETTY is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. KIMESH CHETTY may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. CHETTY is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: University of Queensland Faculty of Medicine, 2016

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 10 Nov 2023
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 01 Jul 2023
Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration Effective: 03 May 2019
First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate Effective: 25 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Transfer of class of registration to: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 10 Nov 2023

DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 01 Jul 2023

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions of certificate of registration
Date: Effective: 03 May 2019

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Postgraduate Education Certificate
Date: Effective: 25 Feb 2019