THE FOLLOWING INFORMATION WAS OBTAINED FROM THE PHYSICIAN REGISTER SECTION OF THE WEBSITE OF THE COLLEGE OF PHYSICIANS AND SURGEONS OF ONTARIO (WWW.CPSO.ON.CA) AS OF THE DATE AND TIME NOTED BELOW
30/04/25 04:38:59 AM

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2001
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SUITE 205-4600 HIGHWAY 7 WEST
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 850-7788
Fax: 905-553-9293
Address: 181 Green Lane E
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17730 Leslie St
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10660 YONGE STREET
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C3C9
Phone: (905) 770-9096
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khorsand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khorsand (CPSO#: 117518 )
Business Address: 10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3E4
(905) 770-9096

General Information

Former Name: No Former Name
Gender: Man
Languages Spoken: ENGLISH, FARSI
Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2001

Practice Information

Primary Business Location: SUITE 205-4600 HIGHWAY 7 WEST
Vaughan Ontario L4L 4Y7
Business Email: No Information Available
Phone: (905) 850-7788
Fax: 905-553-9293
Address: 181 Green Lane E
East Gwillimbury Ontario L9N 0C9
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 17730 Leslie St
Newmarket Ontario L3Y 3E4
Phone: No Information Available
Fax: No Information Available
Address: 10660 YONGE STREET
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C3C9
Phone: (905) 770-9096
Fax: No Information Available

Specialties

SPECIALTY ISSUED ON CERTIFYING BODY
Family Medicine
Effective: 04 Dec 2019
College of Family Physicians of Canada
SPECIALTY: Family Medicine
ISSUED ON: Effective: Dec 04 2019
CERTIFYING BODY: College of Family Physicians of Canada

Hospital Privileges

No information available

Professional Corporation Information

Corporation Name: Khorsand Medicine Professional Corporation
Certificate of Authorization Status: Issued Date: 03 May 2019
Shareholders:
Dr. M. Khorsand (CPSO#: 117518 )
Business Address: 10660 Yonge Street
Richmond Hill Ontario L4C 3E4
(905) 770-9096

Practice Conditions

VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASOUD KHORSAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHORSAND is educated and experienced.
VIEW DETAILS chevron-down icon
(1) Dr. MASOUD KHORSAND may practise only in the areas of medicine in which Dr. KHORSAND is educated and experienced.

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Current Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Past Tribunal Proceedings

No information available

Training

Medical School: Islamic Azad University, 2001

Registration History

DETAILS DATE
Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate Effective: 21 Feb 2020
Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee Effective: 21 Feb 2020
First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate Effective: 12 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Subsequent certificate of registration issued: Independent Practice Certificate
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2020

DETAILS: Expired: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 21 Feb 2020

DETAILS: First certificate of registration issued: Restricted Certificate
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2019
DETAILS: Terms and conditions imposed on certificate by: Registration Committee
Date: Effective: 12 Feb 2019